Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 01/26/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/26/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/26/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 01/26/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 01/26/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/26/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 01/27/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/28/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 01/28/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/02/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/02/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/02/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 02/03/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/04/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/16/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/16/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 02/17/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/18/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/24/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/19/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/10/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/10/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/10/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/17/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/22/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/29/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/30/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/01/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/01/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/13/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/13/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/14/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/27/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/03/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/03/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/04/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 11/10/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/10/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/18/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/25/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/25/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/25/1994