Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/16/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/16/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/05/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/23/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/02/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/29/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/05/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/02/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/14/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew