Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/18/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/18/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/18/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/24/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/25/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/25/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/25/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/16/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/16/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/16/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/16/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/16/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/02/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/02/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/02/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/29/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/29/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/07/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/07/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/07/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 05/07/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/07/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/18/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/18/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/26/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/26/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/10/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 08/03/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/20/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/14/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 11/01/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/14/1994