Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/02/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/02/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/04/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/30/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/24/1993