Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/18/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/18/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/18/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/25/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/29/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/20/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/13/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/13/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/15/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/05/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/03/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/25/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/25/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 01/26/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 01/31/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/10/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/22/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/23/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/02/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/05/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/09/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/17/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/07/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/14/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/27/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/28/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/01/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/01/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/01/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/12/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/13/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/13/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 07/14/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/18/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/18/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/18/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/18/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/22/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/25/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/25/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/26/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/27/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 08/16/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 08/18/1994