Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/16/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/18/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/21/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/27/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/29/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/29/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/15/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 08/03/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/05/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 11/22/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/22/1993