Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/17/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/24/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/24/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/24/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/24/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/24/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/25/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/02/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/02/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/03/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/04/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/18/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/27/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/27/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/29/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/03/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew