Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/22/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/16/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/13/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/14/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/14/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/14/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/14/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 09/23/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/27/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 10/04/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 10/15/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/25/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/03/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/19/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/03/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew