Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/18/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/09/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/09/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/09/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/16/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/10/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/22/1993