Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/16/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/22/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/18/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/25/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 08/04/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 10/13/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/19/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/23/1993