Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/11/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/11/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/11/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/30/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/22/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/22/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/25/1993