Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/30/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/29/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/21/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/21/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/30/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 11/02/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 11/02/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/10/1994