Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/25/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/03/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/03/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/03/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/11/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/11/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/16/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/16/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/16/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/18/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/18/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/23/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/05/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/22/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/22/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/24/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/17/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/17/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 08/06/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/09/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/09/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/23/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/28/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 10/14/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/14/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/28/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/16/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 11/16/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/01/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/07/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/11/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/23/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/23/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/23/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/23/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/08/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/08/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/08/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/23/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/12/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/13/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/13/1994