Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/04/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/11/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/17/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/19/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/22/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/09/1993