Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/09/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/11/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/27/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/27/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/08/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/21/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/19/1993