Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/02/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/09/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/16/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/22/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/19/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/19/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/19/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 04/19/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/11/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 11/01/1993