Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/02/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/18/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/18/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/18/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/26/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/26/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/26/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/26/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/20/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/20/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/20/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 05/20/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/20/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/20/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/20/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/25/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/07/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/15/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/15/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/15/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/16/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/30/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/30/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/30/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/30/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/30/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/01/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/01/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/01/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/01/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/01/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 07/16/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/16/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/16/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/16/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/16/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/16/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/20/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 07/21/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 08/06/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/29/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/29/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/29/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/29/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/29/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/29/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/29/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/29/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 11/10/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/10/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/10/1993