Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/03/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/03/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/03/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/03/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/03/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/03/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/03/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/03/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/24/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/24/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/24/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/24/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/22/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/22/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/22/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/22/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/22/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/20/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/20/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/20/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/20/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/20/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/20/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 04/20/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/20/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/20/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/20/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/20/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/20/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/20/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/20/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/20/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/20/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/20/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/27/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/27/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/05/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/11/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/13/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/13/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/18/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/18/1993