Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/10/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/15/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/25/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/25/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/25/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/25/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/07/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/04/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/11/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/11/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/13/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/13/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/09/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/10/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/16/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/30/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/14/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/21/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 11/04/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/01/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/21/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/21/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew