Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/28/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/03/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/03/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/24/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/25/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/03/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/21/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/21/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/26/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/13/1994