Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 03/11/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/23/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/27/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/05/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/18/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/18/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/22/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/23/1993