Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/01/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/02/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 04/27/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/27/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/28/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/05/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/04/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 10/21/1993