There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for a credit for the portion of employer social security taxes paid with respect to employee cash tips.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/11/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
03/11/1993Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate
03/11/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2801-2802)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/29/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/30/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/31/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/02/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/05/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/05/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/05/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/19/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 04/19/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/19/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/21/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/27/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/27/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/04/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/04/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/05/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/05/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/11/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/12/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/13/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/13/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/13/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 05/18/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/26/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/26/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/07/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/09/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/15/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/29/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/29/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/13/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/13/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/20/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/20/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance03/11/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.573.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.573. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/11/1993)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a tax credit for the portion of employer social security taxes paid with respect to employee cash tips. Makes such credit part of the general business credit.