Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/11/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/15/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/15/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/15/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/18/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/18/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/18/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/22/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/22/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/30/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/04/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/05/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/05/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/18/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/20/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/28/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/07/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/07/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/10/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/22/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/22/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/29/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/14/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/15/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/10/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/20/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/19/1993