Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/31/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/31/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/31/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/31/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/20/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 04/27/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/28/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/28/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/28/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/29/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/04/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/04/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/04/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/07/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/11/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/13/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/26/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/08/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/15/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/15/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/15/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/15/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/15/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/16/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/16/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/24/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/24/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/24/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/24/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/24/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/24/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/24/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/24/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/24/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/24/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/24/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 06/30/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/22/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/20/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/13/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 11/10/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 01/25/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 01/25/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew