Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/01/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/05/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/06/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/15/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 11/01/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/22/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/21/1994