Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/16/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/16/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/16/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/16/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/16/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/03/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/03/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/03/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/03/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/05/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/05/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/10/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/10/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/10/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/16/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/17/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/17/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/31/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/07/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/07/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/19/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/20/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/21/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/27/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/29/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/29/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/04/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/04/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/05/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/05/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/21/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/24/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/24/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/08/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/08/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/08/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/10/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/15/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/14/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/03/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/09/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/10/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/23/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/25/1994