Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/05/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/06/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/17/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/18/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/18/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 11/20/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 11/24/1993