There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Indian Lands Open Dump Cleanup Act of 1994

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Indian Lands Open Dump Cleanup Act of 1994

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Indian Lands Open Dump Cleanup Act of 1994

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Indian Lands Open Dump Cleanup Act of 1994

Short Titles as Introduced

Indian Lands Open Dump Cleanup Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to clean up open dumps on Indian lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/22/1994Became Public Law No: 103-399.
10/22/1994Signed by President.
10/18/1994Presented to President.
10/08/1994Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S15027)
10/05/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/03/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-783.
05/12/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5702-5703)
04/25/1994Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-253.
04/01/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (32)

Date Chamber
10/22/1994Became Public Law No: 103-399.
10/22/1994Signed by President.
10/18/1994SenatePresented to President.
10/12/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/08/1994SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S15027)
10/06/1994SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at the desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
10/05/1994-6:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/05/1994-6:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/05/1994-6:17pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10919)
10/04/1994-9:46pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walker objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed until Oct. 5. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
10/04/1994-9:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/04/1994-9:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10798-10800)
10/04/1994-9:43pmHouseMr. Gejdenson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/03/1994HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430.
10/03/1994HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-783.
09/28/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/28/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/28/1994HouseSubcommittee on Native American Affairs Discharged.
07/26/1994HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs
07/12/1994HouseExecutive Comment Requested from HHS.
07/11/1994HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Native American Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/17/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/16/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/1994-1:14pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/16/1994-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/12/1994SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5702-5703)
04/25/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 417.
04/25/1994SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-253.
04/13/1994SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/03/1993SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held n. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 103-460.
04/01/1993SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
04/01/1993SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4283)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/01/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/05/1993

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs04/01/1993 Referred to
11/03/1993 Hearings by
04/13/1994 Markup by
04/25/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-253
House Natural Resources05/17/1994 Referred to
09/28/1994 Markup by
10/03/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-783
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs07/11/1994 Referred to
07/26/1994 Hearings by
09/28/1994 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.720.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.720. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/05/1994)

Indian Lands Open Dump Cleanup Act of 1994 - Requires the Director of the Indian Health Service to: (1) study and inventory open dumps on Indian and Alaska Native lands; and (2) develop and implement a ten-year plan to address solid waste disposal needs on such lands.

Requires the Director, upon request, to evaluate the health threat of open dumps and provide financial and technical assistance to tribal and Alaska Native entities to close such dumps and provide postclosure maintenance.

Authorizes the Director to carry out at least three tribal or Alaska Native dump closure demonstration projects.

Authorizes appropriations.