Committees: S.720 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs04/01/1993 Referred to
11/03/1993 Hearings by
04/13/1994 Markup by
04/25/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-253
House Natural Resources05/17/1994 Referred to
09/28/1994 Markup by
10/03/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-783
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs07/11/1994 Referred to
07/26/1994 Hearings by
09/28/1994 Discharged from