There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to continue the authorization of appropriations for the East Court of the National Museum of Natural History, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/06/1993Became Public Law No: 103-98.
10/06/1993Signed by President.
09/24/1993Presented to President.
09/21/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/09/1993Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 103-232, Part I.
05/28/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6887)
05/24/1993Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford without amendment. With written report No. 103-48.
04/07/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/06/1993Became Public Law No: 103-98.
10/06/1993Signed by President.
09/24/1993SenatePresented to President.
09/21/1993-2:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/1993-2:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/21/1993-2:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/21/1993-2:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6798-6799)
09/21/1993-2:30pmHouseMr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/09/1993HouseReported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 103-232, Part I.
08/05/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
08/05/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
08/04/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
08/04/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
06/21/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
06/16/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
06/08/1993HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
06/08/1993HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on House Administration.
06/08/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/08/1993-12:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/28/1993SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6887)
05/24/1993SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71.
05/24/1993SenateCommittee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford without amendment. With written report No. 103-48.
05/20/1993SenateCommittee on Rules. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/07/1993SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/07/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/07/1993

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration04/07/1993 Referred to
05/20/1993 Markup by
05/24/1993 Reported by S.Rept 103-48
House Administration06/08/1993 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials06/16/1993 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation06/08/1993 Referred to
08/05/1993 Markup by
09/09/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-232 Part 1
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds06/21/1993 Referred to
08/04/1993 Markup by
08/04/1993 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.779. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/07/1993)

Amends Federal law which authorizes the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution to plan, design, construct, and equip space in the East Court of the National Museum of Natural History to provide that the appropriation authorized for such purpose is to continue for fiscal years after FY 1991.