Committees: S.779 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration04/07/1993 Referred to
05/20/1993 Markup by
05/24/1993 Reported by S.Rept 103-48
House Administration06/08/1993 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials06/16/1993 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation06/08/1993 Referred to
08/05/1993 Markup by
09/09/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-232 Part 1
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds06/21/1993 Referred to
08/04/1993 Markup by
08/04/1993 Reported by