Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/07/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/07/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/28/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/28/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 04/28/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/29/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/29/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/29/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/06/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 05/11/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/11/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/26/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/09/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/10/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/22/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/22/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/20/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/27/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/28/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/28/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/06/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 08/06/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/08/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/08/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/08/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 09/08/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/10/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/10/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/10/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/10/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/10/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/10/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 09/10/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/10/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/10/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/10/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/10/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/10/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/10/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/10/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/10/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/10/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 09/10/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/10/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 09/10/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/14/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/15/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/15/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/20/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/21/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/23/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/23/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/29/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/30/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/06/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/06/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/26/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 11/02/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 11/19/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/22/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/22/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/28/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew