Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/21/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 01/26/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/02/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/03/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/19/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/19/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/05/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/05/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/05/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/12/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 11/16/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/16/1993