There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

High-Speed Ground Transportation Development Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

High-Speed Rail Development Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a program to facilitate development of high-speed rail transportation in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/23/1993Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-208.
04/28/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date
08/18/1994Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12133)
Action By: Senate
08/18/1994Senate passed companion measure H.R. 4867 in lieu of this measure by Voice Vote.
Action By: Senate
08/18/1994Senate incorporated this measure in H.R. 4867 as an amendment.
Action By: Senate
08/18/1994S.Amdt.2570 Amendment SP 2570 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
Action By: Senate
08/18/1994S.Amdt.2570 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Exon. To authorize appropriations for high-speed ground transportation.
Action By: Senate
08/18/1994Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S12128)
Action By: Senate
11/23/1993Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 337.
Action By: Senate
11/23/1993Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-208.
11/09/1993Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/20/1993Subcommittee on Surface Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 103-126.
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation
04/28/1993Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Action By: Senate
04/28/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5036)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/28/1993 Referred to
11/09/1993 Markup by
11/23/1993 Reported by S.Rept 103-208
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation05/20/1993 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.839. View summaries

Shown Here:
Indefinitely postponed in Senate (08/18/1994)

High-Speed Ground Transportation Development Act of 1994 - Amends Federal transportation law to authorize the Secretary of Transportation (Secretary) to provide financial assistance to an applicant for up to 50 percent of the publicly funded costs for corridor planning activities (engineering, operational, financial, environmental, or socioeconomic projections for the establishment of high-speed rail service that leads to development of a prudent financial and institutional plan for implementation of specific high-speed rail improvements). Prohibits the use of such assistance for corridor planning with respect to the main line of the Northeast Corridor, between Washington, D.C., and Boston, Massachusetts.

Authorizes the Secretary to undertake activities for the improvement, adaptation, and integration of technologies for commercial application in high-speed rail service in the United States. Requires the Secretary to promulgate safety regulations necessary for high-speed rail.

(Sec. 4) Requires the Secretary, or the Secretary of the Treasury, to authorize the Delta Transportation Company, doing business as the Columbus and Greenville Railway, to redeem its outstanding obligations and liabilities.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes appropriations for FY 1996 and 1997.