Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/04/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/04/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/20/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/20/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/20/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/28/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/08/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/08/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/17/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/24/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/20/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/27/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/30/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 08/03/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/18/1993