Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/12/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/12/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 05/12/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 05/12/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/12/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/18/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/20/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 11/22/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/22/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/01/1994