Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/19/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/10/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/10/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/15/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/17/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/17/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/13/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/13/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/15/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/16/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/22/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/27/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 07/28/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 10/19/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 11/10/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 11/19/1993