Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/20/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/20/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/20/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/17/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/22/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/30/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/14/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/20/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/18/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/20/1993