Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/30/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/05/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/05/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/29/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/29/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/29/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/27/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/02/1993