Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/28/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/28/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/28/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 05/28/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/28/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/28/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/28/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/17/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/17/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/17/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/23/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/30/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/30/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/30/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/30/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/20/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/20/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/20/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/14/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/20/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/15/1994