Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/20/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/20/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/20/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/20/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 10/20/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/20/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/20/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/20/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/20/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/20/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/20/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/20/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/20/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 10/20/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/20/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/20/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/20/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/20/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/20/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/20/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/20/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/20/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 10/20/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/05/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/05/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 11/05/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 11/05/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/05/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/05/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/05/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/05/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/05/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 11/19/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/19/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/19/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/03/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/03/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/03/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/03/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/03/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/03/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/03/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/03/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/03/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/07/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/07/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/07/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/07/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 02/07/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/07/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/07/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/07/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/10/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/10/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/10/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/24/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/24/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/24/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/24/1994