Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 08/06/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 08/06/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 08/06/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/20/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/20/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/01/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 11/01/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 11/01/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 11/05/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/16/1993