Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 11/05/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/05/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/05/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 11/05/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 11/05/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/16/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 11/17/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/18/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 11/19/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 11/22/1993