Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/07/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/07/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/07/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/02/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/02/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/02/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/15/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/15/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/13/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/13/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/13/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/13/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/13/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/13/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/19/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/19/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/19/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/19/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/19/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/19/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 04/21/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/21/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/21/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/05/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/05/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/05/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/05/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/05/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/05/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/05/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/05/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/05/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/05/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/10/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/25/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/25/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/25/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/25/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/25/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 05/25/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/25/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/25/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 05/25/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/09/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/09/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/09/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/22/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/22/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/22/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/22/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/22/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/22/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/22/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/22/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/23/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/23/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/20/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/20/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/20/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/28/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/11/1994