There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the week of July 25 through July 31, 1993, as the "National Week of Recognition and Remembrance for Those Who Served in the Korean War".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/23/1993Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9366)
06/10/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/26/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/26/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
07/26/1993-12:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/23/1993SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/23/1993SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9366)
06/10/1993SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
06/10/1993SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7104)

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/22/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/22/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/22/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/22/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/22/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 07/22/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/22/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/22/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/22/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/22/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/22/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/22/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/22/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/22/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/22/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/22/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/22/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/22/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/22/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/22/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/22/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/22/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/22/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/22/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/22/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/22/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/22/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/22/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/22/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/22/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/22/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/22/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/22/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/22/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/22/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/22/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/22/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/22/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/22/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/22/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/22/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/22/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/22/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/22/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/22/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/22/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/22/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/22/1993

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/10/1993 Referred to
07/23/1993 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service07/26/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.101. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/10/1993)

Designates July 25 through 31, 1993, as National Week of Recognition and Remembrance for Those Who Served in the Korean War.

Authorizes the President to urge U.S. departments and agencies, interested organizations, groups, and individuals to fly the American flag at half-staff on July 27, 1993, in honor of the Americans who died as a result of their service in Korea.