Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/15/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/20/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/20/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/21/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/22/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/22/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/22/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/27/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/27/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/29/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/04/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 08/04/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/09/1993