Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/28/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/28/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/28/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/28/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/28/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/28/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/28/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/30/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/30/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/04/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/09/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/09/1993