Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/03/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 08/03/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 08/03/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/07/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/07/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/07/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/07/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/07/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/07/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/07/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/07/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/07/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/07/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/28/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/28/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/28/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/28/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/28/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/28/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/28/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/28/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/28/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/28/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/28/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/29/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/29/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/29/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/30/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 11/01/1993