There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate October 6, 1993 and 1994, as "German-American Day".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/06/1993Became Public Law No: 103-100.
10/06/1993Signed by President.
09/30/1993Presented to President.
09/28/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/28/1993Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
08/04/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S10452)
08/04/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/06/1993Became Public Law No: 103-100.
10/06/1993Signed by President.
09/30/1993SenatePresented to President.
09/28/1993-7:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/1993-7:15pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
09/28/1993-7:09pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7136-7137)
09/28/1993-7:09pmHouseMr. Wynn asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/1993HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
08/05/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
08/05/1993-1:42pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/05/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/04/1993SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S10452)

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/04/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 08/04/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 08/04/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service08/05/1993 Referred to
09/28/1993 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.121.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.121. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/04/1993)

Designates October 6, 1993 and 1994, as German-American Day.